WA SB6209 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joining the nurse licensure compact.
Title
Joining the nurse licensure compact.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2376 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-17 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.