WA SB6229 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Streamlining reporting for recipients of housing-related state funding by removing Washington state quality award program requirements.
Title
Streamlining reporting for recipients of housing-related state funding by removing Washington state quality award program requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 155, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-29 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2348 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.