WA SB6232 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a pilot common public records portal.
Title
Establishing a pilot common public records portal.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | SGE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |