WA SB6282 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the development of individualized highly capable learning plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the development of individualized highly capable learning plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2020-02-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2020-02-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17SenateFloor amendment
2020-02-17Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-03SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-03SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-03SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback