WA SB6287 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making technical changes regarding the department of children, youth, and families.
Title
Making technical changes regarding the department of children, youth, and families.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2018. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Chapter 58, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-23 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-23 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2512 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.