WA SB6304 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Assisting homeless individuals in obtaining Washington state identicards.
Title
Assisting homeless individuals in obtaining Washington state identicards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2607 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6304&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6304.pdf |