WA SB6323 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the board of engineers and land surveyors' appointment of its director and agreement with the department of licensing.
Title
Concerning the board of engineers and land surveyors' appointment of its director and agreement with the department of licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2833 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6323&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6323.pdf |