WA SB6340 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Aligning student transportation formulas with 2013 session laws.
Title
Aligning student transportation formulas with 2013 session laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2715 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-11 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.