WA SB6450 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the warm water fishing advisory group.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the warm water fishing advisory group.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-11SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2020-02-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-06SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2020-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-31SenateOn motion, referred to Ways & Means.
2020-01-30SenateAWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Same As/Similar To

HB2666 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback