WA SB6457 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting housing affordability by incentivizing the construction of American dream homes.
Title
Promoting housing affordability by incentivizing the construction of American dream homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | HSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |