WA SB6523 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning local government issuance of a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth.
Title
Concerning local government issuance of a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2764 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.