WA SB6553 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Facilitating treatment for gun violence victims.
Title
Facilitating treatment for gun violence victims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | BH - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | LAW - Majority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |