WA SB6585 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the use of medication-assisted treatment within jails.
Title
Encouraging the use of medication-assisted treatment within jails.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |