WA SJR8202 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Constitution to address reproductive freedom.
Title
Amending the Constitution to address reproductive freedom.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR4201 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.