WI AB249 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 5.07; to amend 5.05 (1) (f), 5.06 (2), 5.25 (4) (b), 12.09 (1) and (3), 12.60 (1) (a), 939.50 (3) (d) and 939.50 (3) (e); and to create 5.07 (2), 5.34, 5.35 (6) (a) 4c., 7.08 (3) (d) to (g), 7.08 (11), 12.17, 12.19, 12.60 (1) (am), 12.60 (1) (an), 12.60 (1) (ap) and 12.60 (1) (bn) of the statutes; relating to: deceptive election practices; voter intimidation, suppression, and protection; granting rule-making authority; and providing penalties.
Title
Deceptive election practices; voter intimidation, suppression, and protection; granting rule-making authority; and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-09-11 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-06-03 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-04-30 | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Campaign Reform | |
2009-04-30 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab249 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB249.pdf |