WI AB35 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Published 3-27-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Published 3-27-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 101.861 of the statutes; and to affect 2007 Wisconsin Act 63, section 44 (1); Relating to: the effective date for licensing and registration requirements for electricians and electrical contractors. (FE)
Title
The effective date for licensing and registration requirements for electricians and electrical contractors. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | Published 3-27-2013 |
2013-03-14 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-13-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 4 |
2013-03-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-12-2013 |
2013-03-07 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-7-2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 18, Noes 15 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Vinehout |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-5-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-02-28 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-02-28 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-02-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-02-28 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-02-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 39 |
2013-02-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2013-02-28 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 38 |
2013-02-28 | House | Read a second time |
2013-02-28 | House | Placed on the calendar of 2-28-2013 following Assembly Bill 37 |
2013-02-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Sinicki, C. Taylor, Ohnstad and Kahl |
2013-02-28 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sinicki and Kahl |
2013-02-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Knodl and Sinicki |
2013-02-26 | House | Placed on calendar 2-28-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-02-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-02-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sinicki, C. Taylor and Ohnstad |
2013-02-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-02-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor |
2013-02-19 | House | Introduced |