WI AB563 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 165.785 (1) (b) 3., 165.785 (2r) and 175.51 (title); and to create 175.51 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: dissemination of threats against law enforcement.
Title
Dissemination of threats against law enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-10-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2017-10-19 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab563 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB563.pdf |