WI AB779 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Published 5-25-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Published 5-25-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 153.85, 153.86 and 153.90; to amend 20.435 (1) (hg), 146.37 (1g), 153.01 (intro.), 153.01 (4j) (b), 153.01 (8m), 153.05 (1) (b), 153.05 (2m) (a), 153.05 (2m) (b), 153.05 (2r) (intro.), 153.05 (2s), 153.05 (3) (a), 153.05 (3) (b), 153.05 (3) (c), 153.05 (8) (a), 153.05 (8) (b), 153.05 (9) (a), 153.05 (9) (b), 153.05 (9) (c), 153.455 (4), 153.50 (3) (b) (intro.), 153.50 (3) (c), 153.50 (3) (d), 153.50 (3m), 153.50 (5) (a) 4. b., 153.50 (6) (a), 153.50 (6) (b), 153.50 (6) (c) (intro.), 153.55, 153.60 (1), 153.75 (2) (a), 153.75 (2) (c) and 895.043 (2); and to create subchapter I (title) of chapter 153 [precedes 153.01], subchapter II (title) of chapter 153 [precedes 153.80], 153.80, 153.81 and 153.82 of the statutes; relating to: designation of a corporation to receive funding for electronic health information exchange, creation of a corporation, and making an appropriation.
Title
Designation of a corporation to receive funding for electronic health information exchange, creation of a corporation, and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Published 5-25-2010 | |
2010-05-11 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-11-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 274 | |
2010-05-10 | Presented to the Governor on 5-10-2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-22 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 29, Noes 4 | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-22 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rural Issues, Biofuels, and Information Technology and take up | |
2010-04-21 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rural Issues, Biofuels, and Information Technology | |
2010-04-21 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 1 | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-15 | Made a special order of business at 11:12 A.M. on 4-20-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | |
2010-04-09 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-09 | Report passage recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-07 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | |
2010-03-29 | Report passage recommended by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-24 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-03 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-01 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-25 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Healthcare Reform | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced |