WI AB793 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 23.175 (2) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: including water trails in the state trail system. (FE)
Title
Including water trails in the state trail system. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-27 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2014-03-27 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Kolste added as a coauthor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2014-03-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative A. Ott |
2014-02-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab793 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB793.pdf |