WI AB793 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Published 4-15-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Published 4-15-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 39.399 (1); to amend 39.399 (2), 39.399 (3) (a), 39.399 (3) (b) 1. and 39.399 (4); and to create 39.399 (1g) of the statutes; Relating to: the teacher loan program. (FE)
Title
The teacher loan program. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | House | Published 4-15-2016 |
2016-04-15 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-14-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 359 |
2016-04-13 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-13-2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 31, Noes 1 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Universities and Technical Colleges and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Technical Colleges |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 94, Noes 0, Paired 2 |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 33 |
2016-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and taken up |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-17 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Danou, Hesselbein, Doyle, Considine, Ohnstad, Spreitzer, Hebl, Pope, Berceau and Kahl |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:55 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Mining and Rural Development, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mining and Rural Development |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced |