WI AB86 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 302.042, 302.045 (3m) (d), 302.05 (3) (c) 3., 302.113 (2) (b), 302.113 (2) (c), 302.113 (3) (e), 302.113 (9h), 302.1135, 304.06 (1) (bg), 304.06 (1) (bk), 304.06 (1) (bn), 304.06 (1) (br), 973.01 (3d), 973.01 (4m), 973.031, 973.09 (3) (d) and 973.195 (1r) (j); to renumber and amend 302.05 (1) and 302.113 (2) (a); to amend 15.01 (2), 15.06 (6), 15.145 (1), 17.07 (3m), 20.410 (2) (title), 20.410 (2) (a), 20.923 (4) (b) 6., 230.08 (2) (pd), 301.03 (3), 301.048 (2) (am) 3., 301.21 (1m) (c), 301.21 (2m) (c), 302.045 (1), 302.045 (3), 302.05 (title), 302.05 (2), 302.05 (3) (b), 302.05 (3) (c) 1., 302.05 (3) (c) 2. (intro.), 302.05 (3) (d), 302.11 (1g) (b) (intro.), 302.11 (1g) (b) 2., 302.11 (1g) (c), 302.11 (1g) (d), 302.11 (1m), 302.11 (7) (c), 302.113 (1), 302.113 (3) (d), 302.113 (7), 302.113 (9) (am), 302.113 (9) (c), 302.114 (9) (am), 302.114 (9) (c), 304.01 (title), 304.01 (1), 304.01 (2) (intro.), 304.01 (2) (b), 304.01 (2) (c), 304.01 (2) (d), 304.06 (title), 304.06 (1) (b), 304.06 (1) (c) (intro.), 304.06 (1) (d) 1., 304.06 (1) (d) 2., 304.06 (1) (d) 3m., 304.06 (1) (d) 4., 304.06 (1) (e), 304.06 (1) (eg), 304.06 (1) (em), 304.06 (1) (f), 304.06 (1) (g), 304.06 (1m) (intro.), 304.06 (1q) (b), 304.06 (1q) (c), 304.06 (1x), 304.06 (2m) (d), 304.06 (3), 304.06 (3e), 304.06 (3m), 304.071 (1), 801.50 (5), 809.30 (1) (c), 911.01 (4) (c), 950.04 (1v) (f), 950.04 (1v) (g), 950.04 (1v) (gm), 950.04 (1v) (nt), 973.01 (4), 973.01 (7), 973.195 (1r) (a), 974.07 (4) (b), 976.03 (23) (c) and 977.05 (4) (jm); to repeal and recreate 302.045 (2) (d); and to create 302.043, 302.05 (1) (am) 1., 302.05 (1) (am) 2., 302.05 (1) (b), 302.113 (9g) and 973.198 of the statutes; relating to: corrections and sentencing. (FE)
Title
Corrections and sentencing. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-09-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-17 | House | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representative Radcliffe |
2011-05-17 | House | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representative Radcliffe |
2011-05-17 | House | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 5-17-2011 |
2011-05-17 | House | LRB correction |
2011-05-12 | House | Placed on calendar 5-17-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-05-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-05-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2011-05-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2011-05-12 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2011-05-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-05-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-04-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-15 | House | Representative Farrow added as a coauthor |
2011-04-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-07 | House | Representative Williams added as a coauthor |
2011-04-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2011-04-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab86 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB86.pdf |