WI AB876 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 192.32 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: pedestrians crossing railroads.
Title
Pedestrians crossing railroads.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Nerison [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Mark Miller [D] |
Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 59, Noes 34, Paired 2 |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Representative Danou added as a coauthor |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-17 | House | Senator Shilling added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:12 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 5 |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-02-10 | House | Senator Miller withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2016-02-10 | House | Senator Vinehout added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-09 | House | Senator Nass added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced |