WI AJR59 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 61-29)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: commemorating the 75th anniversary of D-Day on June 6, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorating the 75th anniversary of D-Day on June 6, 2019.

Sponsors

Rep. Jim Ott [R]Rep. Robert Wittke [R]Rep. Gordon Hintz [D]Rep. John Jagler [R]
Rep. Jill Billings [D]Rep. Scott Allen [R]Rep. Sondy Pope [D]Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R]
Rep. Mary Felzkowski [R]Rep. Don Vruwink [D]Rep. John Spiros [R]Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R]
Rep. Shae Sortwell [R]Rep. Treig Pronschinske [R]Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R]Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R]
Rep. Warren Petryk [R]Rep. Joan Ballweg [R]Rep. Christine Sinicki [D]Rep. Cody Horlacher [R]
Rep. Tony Kurtz [R]Rep. Jon Plumer [R]Rep. James Edming [R]Rep. Cindi Duchow [R]
Rep. Travis Tranel [R]Rep. Ron Tusler [R]Rep. Nick Milroy [D]Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]
Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R]Rep. Paul Tittl [R]Rep. Jessie Rodriguez [R]Rep. Steve Doyle [D]
Rep. Dianne Hesselbein [D]Rep. Dan Knodl [R]Rep. John Macco [R]Rep. Gae Magnafici [R]
Rep. Robert Kulp [R]Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R]Rep. Mark Spreitzer [D]Rep. Romaine Quinn [R]
Rep. David Murphy [R]Rep. Joel Kitchens [R]Rep. Dave Considine [D]Rep. Debra Kolste [D]
Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D]Rep. Rob Swearingen [R]Rep. Jason Fields [D]Rep. Beth Meyers [D]
Rep. Nancy Vander Meer [R]Rep. Terry Katsma [R]Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R]Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R]
Rep. Rob Summerfield [R]Rep. Jodi Emerson [D]Rep. Tyler August [R]Rep. Michael Schraa [R]
Rep. Staush Gruszynski [D]Rep. Rick Gundrum [R]Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R]Rep. Jesse James [R]
Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R]Rep. Gary Tauchen [R]Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D]Rep. Lisa Subeck [D]
Rep. Katrina Shankland [D]Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R]Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R]Rep. David Bowen [D]
Rep. Melissa Sargent [D]Sen. Steve Nass [R]Sen. Jennifer Shilling [D]Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R]
Sen. Janet Bewley [D]Sen. David Craig [R]Sen. Van Wanggaard [R]Sen. Patrick Testin [R]
Sen. Fred Risser [D]Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D]Sen. Mark Miller [D]Sen. Andre Jacque [R]
Sen. Robert Wirch [D]Sen. Patty Schachtner [D]Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R]Sen. Robert Cowles [R]
Sen. Chris Kapenga [R]Sen. Janis Ringhand [D]Sen. Howard Marklein [R]Sen. Duey Stroebel [R]
Sen. Alberta Darling [R]Sen. Luther Olsen [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-06-24SenateRead and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2019-06-18SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-06-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-18HouseAdopted
2019-06-13HousePlaced on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-06-11HouseRead and referred to Committee on Rules
2019-06-11HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback