WI SB232 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 446.02 (7) (a), 446.02 (7) (d) 1. and 446.02 (7) (d) 2.; to amend 440.05 (intro.), 441.001 (3) (a), 441.001 (4) (b), 446.02 (1) (b), 446.026 (1) (a), 446.03 (intro.), 446.03 (1), 446.04 (2), 446.04 (4), 446.05 (1) and 451.02 (1); to repeal and recreate 440.05 (intro.); and to create 36.24, 38.235, 118.294, 440.08 (2) (a) 23k., 446.01 (1b), 446.01 (1f), 446.01 (1g), 446.01 (1v), 446.02 (2) (d), 446.02 (2) (dm), 446.02 (7) (a) 2., 446.02 (10m), 446.023, 446.04 (6) and 632.87 (3) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: physical examinations conducted by chiropractors; performance of medical examinations by chiropractors for the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration; chiropractic acupuncture and chiropractic dry needling; delegation of certain services by a chiropractor; modifying various administrative rules promulgated by the Chiropractic Examining Board; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Physical examinations conducted by chiropractors; performance of medical examinations by chiropractors for the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration; chiropractic acupuncture and chiropractic dry needling; delegation of certain services by a chiropractor; modifying various administrative rules promulgated by the Chiropractic Examining Board; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] |
Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] |
Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-06-13 | Senate | LRB correction |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb232 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB232.pdf |