WI SB246 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.21 (4), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.34 (1k) (g), 71.45 (2) (a) 10. and 77.92 (4); and to create 71.05 (6) (a) 25., 71.05 (6) (a) 26., 71.05 (6) (b) 47., 71.05 (6) (b) 48., 71.05 (6) (b) 49., 71.07 (6s), 71.10 (4) (cs), 71.26 (2) (a) 10., 71.28 (6s), 71.30 (3) (dn), 71.45 (2) (a) 19., 71.47 (6s), 71.49 (1) (dn) and 106.115 of the statutes; relating to: a lifelong learning accounts program and creating income tax modifications and an income tax credit for contributions and withdrawals related to lifelong learning accounts, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Title
A lifelong learning accounts program and creating income tax modifications and an income tax credit for contributions and withdrawals related to lifelong learning accounts, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-01-11 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-06 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-07-28 | Read first time and referred to committee on Children and Families and Workforce Development | |
2009-07-28 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb246 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB246.pdf |