WI SB446 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 20.855 (4) (bg) of the statutes; Relating to: the University of Wisconsin Missing-in-Action Recovery and Identification Project and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The University of Wisconsin Missing-in-Action Recovery and Identification Project and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors

Sen. Roger Roth [R]Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R]Sen. Fred Risser [D]Sen. Mark Miller [D]
Sen. Scott Fitzgerald [R]Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R]Sen. Janet Bewley [D]Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D]
Sen. Robert Cowles [R]Sen. Alberta Darling [R]Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D]Sen. Dan Feyen [R]
Sen. David Hansen [D]Sen. Chris Kapenga [R]Sen. Christopher Larson [D]Sen. Devin LeMahieu [R]
Sen. Howard Marklein [R]Sen. Steve Nass [R]Sen. Luther Olsen [R]Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R]
Sen. Janis Ringhand [D]Sen. Patty Schachtner [D]Sen. Lena Taylor [D]Sen. Patrick Testin [R]
Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R]Sen. Van Wanggaard [R]Sen. Robert Wirch [D]Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]
Rep. Christine Sinicki [D]Rep. Scott Allen [R]Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D]Rep. Jill Billings [D]
Rep. David Bowen [D]Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R]Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D]Rep. Dave Considine [D]
Rep. Steve Doyle [D]Rep. Cindi Duchow [R]Rep. James Edming [R]Rep. Jodi Emerson [D]
Rep. Jason Fields [D]Rep. Staush Gruszynski [D]Rep. Rick Gundrum [R]Rep. Gary Hebl [D]
Rep. Dianne Hesselbein [D]Rep. Cody Horlacher [R]Rep. John Jagler [R]Rep. Jesse James [R]
Rep. Terry Katsma [R]Rep. Dan Knodl [R]Rep. Scott Krug [R]Rep. Robert Kulp [R]
Rep. Tony Kurtz [R]Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R]Rep. Gae Magnafici [R]Rep. Beth Meyers [D]
Rep. Nick Milroy [D]Rep. David Murphy [R]Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D]Rep. Loren Oldenburg [R]
Rep. Jim Ott [R]Rep. Kevin Petersen [R]Rep. Warren Petryk [R]Rep. Jon Plumer [R]
Rep. Sondy Pope [D]Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R]Rep. Daniel Riemer [D]Rep. Jessie Rodriguez [R]
Rep. Melissa Sargent [D]Rep. Katrina Shankland [D]Rep. Shae Sortwell [R]Rep. John Spiros [R]
Rep. Mark Spreitzer [D]Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D]Rep. Amanda Stuck [D]Rep. Lisa Subeck [D]
Rep. Rob Summerfield [R]Rep. Gary Tauchen [R]Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R]Rep. Paul Tittl [R]
Rep. Travis Tranel [R]Rep. Ron Tusler [R]Rep. Nancy Vander Meer [R]Rep. Don Vruwink [D]
Rep. Robert Wittke [R]Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D]Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R]Rep. Mary Felzkowski [R]

Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 98, Noes 0
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-19HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Skowronski
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 11:42 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2020-01-21HouseReceived from Senate
2020-01-21SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
2020-01-21SenateRules suspended
2020-01-21SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-21SenateRead a second time
2020-01-21SenateSenators Johnson, Shilling and Smith added as coauthors
2020-01-17SenatePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-01-17SenateWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-01-17SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-01-09SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-01-09SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-01-08SenateExecutive action taken
2019-12-19SenateRepresentative Steffen added as a cosponsor
2019-10-22SenatePublic hearing held
2019-10-17SenateRepresentative Vining added as a cosponsor
2019-10-03SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-01SenateRepresentative C. Taylor added as a cosponsor
2019-09-23SenateSenator Jacque added as a coauthor
2019-09-23SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs
2019-09-23SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback