WI SB48 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 119.04 (1); and to create 38.12 (12), 66.0138 and 120.12 (28) of the statutes; Relating to: funding postretirement health care benefits of local government employees.
Title
Funding postretirement health care benefits of local government employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Vukmir |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Local Government |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb48 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB48.pdf |