WV HB2729 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2729
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to enact the Recognition of Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact. The bill enters the state into the Compact with all jurisdictions that also enact the compact.
Title
Recognition of Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2019-02-26 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-05 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-05 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-01-30 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-30 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Government Organization |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2729 (Carry Over) 2019-03-09 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
SB432 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - To House Government Organization
SB432 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 56 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |