WV HCR56 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the Joint Committee on Government and Finance study the Public Employees Insurance Agency and potential alternative methods to control healthcare costs
Title
Requesting the Joint Committee on Government and Finance study the Public Employees Insurance Agency and potential alternative methods to control healthcare costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | To Rules |
2018-03-08 | Senate | To Rules |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2018-03-07 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2018-03-07 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Be adopted |
2018-02-08 | House | To House Rules |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-08 | House | To Rules |
2018-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |