WV SB11 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to retirement and pension benefits of certain PERS and Teachers Retirement System members who serve in Legislature
Title
Relating to retirement and pension benefits of certain PERS and Teachers Retirement System members who serve in Legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 194) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-25 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 194) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Pensions |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 7A | 17c | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text |