WV SB150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB150
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Bill
Title
Budget Bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 3rd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/6/19 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/5/19 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Stollings Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Prezioso Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Stollings/Prezioso Floor amendment #2 adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Stollings/Prezioso Floor amendment #1 withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Stollings/Prezioso Floor amendment reported |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Woelfel Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Baldwin Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/4/19 with right to amend |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB150 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading