WV SB425 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 148, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 148, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide West Virginia University, Marshall University, and the Osteopathic School of Medicine with more authority to invest assets of the respective institutions.
Title
Relating to investments by MU, WVU and WVSOM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 588) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 148, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 588) |
2015-03-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Do pass |
2015-03-06 | House | To House Finance |
2015-03-06 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-02-20 | House | To House Education |
2015-02-20 | House | To Education then Finance |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-06 | Senate | To Education |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-06 | Senate | To Education |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2815 (Same As) 2015-02-19 - To House Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1 | 12d | Amended Code | Citation Text |