WV SB602 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-13 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-13 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to repeal outdated and obsolete sections of the tax code.
Title
Repealing outdated and obsolete sections of tax code
Sponsors
Sen. Truman Chafin [D] | Sen. Walt Helmick [D] | Sen. Brooks McCabe [D] | Sen. Joseph Minard [D] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Randy White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-13 | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | Amendments pending | |
2010-03-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-04 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-01 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-01 | Reference dispensed | |
2010-03-01 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-26 | Ordered to House | |
2010-02-26 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) | |
2010-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-26 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-25 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-24 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-23 | Reported do pass | |
2010-02-18 | To Finance | |
2010-02-18 | To Finance | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-18 | To Finance | |
2010-02-18 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4535 (Same As) 2010-03-13 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 10 | 24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 10B | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 10B | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 10B | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 10B | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 10B | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 10B | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 10B | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 10B | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 10D | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 13 | 29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 1B | 17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 2 | 11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 24 | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 3 | 10b | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 4 | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 5 | 10a | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 6 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 6D | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 6D | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 6D | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 6D | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 6D | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 6D | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 6D | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 6D | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 7 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=602&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |