WV SB670 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 95, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to WV College Prepaid Tuition and Savings Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to WV College Prepaid Tuition and Savings Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 636) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 258) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 95, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 636)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseDo pass
2019-03-02HouseTo House Finance
2019-03-02HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-27HouseTo House Education
2019-02-27HouseTo Education then Finance
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-26SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-26SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 258)
2019-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-25SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-25SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-23SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-23SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-22SenateReported do pass
2019-02-22SenateOriginating in Senate Education

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18302Amended CodeCitation Text
18303Amended CodeCitation Text
18304Amended CodeCitation Text
18307Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback