AK HB140 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/6/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/6/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Alaska Railroad Corporation to issue revenue bonds to finance a positive train control rail transportation safety project that qualifies for federal financial participation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Leg. Approval: Ak Railroad Revenue Bonds
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Thompson [R] | Rep. Charles Chenault [R] | Rep. Michael Hawker [R] | Rep. Tammie Wilson [R] |
Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/6/15 |
2015-05-12 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/5 CHAPTER 8 SLA 15 |
2015-04-17 | House | 5:12 PM 4/17/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-04-16 | Senate | VERSION: HB 140 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2015-04-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-16 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 140 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-04-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE, DUNLEAVY, OLSON |
2015-04-15 | Senate | DP: MACKINNON, BISHOP, HOFFMAN |
2015-04-15 | Senate | FIN RPT 3DP 3NR |
2015-04-08 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, EGAN, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY |
2015-04-08 | Senate | TRA RPT 4DP |
2015-04-01 | Senate | TRA, FIN |
2015-04-01 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-03-31 | House | VERSION: HB 140 |
2015-03-31 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2015-03-31 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-03-31 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2015-03-31 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 140 |
2015-03-31 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-03-31 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-03-31 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2015-03-23 | House | NR: SADDLER, PRUITT, GUTTENBERG, GATTIS, EDGMON, NEUMAN |
2015-03-23 | House | DP: GARA, MUNOZ, THOMPSON |
2015-03-23 | House | FIN RPT 3DP 6NR |
2015-03-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WILSON |
2015-03-09 | House | FIN |
2015-03-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Bonds & Bonding
Corporations
Debt
Finance
Funds
Legislative Committees
Legislature
Railroad
Revenue
Safety
Transportation
Corporations
Debt
Finance
Funds
Legislative Committees
Legislature
Railroad
Revenue
Safety
Transportation