AL HB435 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:24 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:24 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clay Co., sheriff, participation in Employees' Retirement System, prohibited from participating in supernumerary program, const. amend.
Title
Clay Co., sheriff, participation in Employees' Retirement System, prohibited from participating in supernumerary program, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Hurst motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Hurst motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:24 p.m. on May 2, 2017. |
2017-05-02 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-193. |
2017-05-02 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 769 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 412 |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 413 |
2017-04-06 | House | Hurst Resolution of Local Application Offered |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |