CA AB2644 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13017 to the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: drug cartels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13017 | New Code | See Bill Text |