CA SB59 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 24300) to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to menstrual products.
Title
Menstrual Product Accessibility Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB59 Skinner et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3054.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3010.) (January 18). |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 574.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 339.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH. |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Read first time. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 19. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 24300 | New Code | See Bill Text |