CT HB05526 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Bureau of Child Support Enforcement to establish and maintain a list of delinquent child support obligors and require the Department of Social Services to post on its Internet web site identifying information relating to the top one hundred delinquent child support obligors.
Title
An Act Concerning Delinquent Child Support Obligors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 447 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 281 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 281 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-21 | House | Public Act 14-177 |
2014-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Passed |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 593 |
2014-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-06 | House | House Passed |
2014-04-17 | House | File Number 633 |
2014-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 403 |
2014-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/31 |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |