CT SB00292 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the use of PFAS in certain products.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Pfas In Certain Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 208 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 169 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 169 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-07 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-03 | House | House Calendar Number 466 |
2024-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5301 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | File Number 306 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 208 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |