CT SB00787 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - File Number 761
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - File Number 761
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Revenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | File Number 761 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 462 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/17 10:00 AM |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |