DC B23-0083 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0537 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0537 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it limits the application of contributory negligence in cases of a collision between an electric mobility device user and a motor vehicle. An electric mobility device is defined as an electric scooter or battery-assisted bicycle.
Title
Vulnerable User Collision Recovery Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Council | Act A23-0537 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00013 |
2020-12-23 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0537 |
2020-12-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 24, 2020 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0083 |
2019-06-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0083 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-01-22 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |