DC B23-0752 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0512 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14414
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0512 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14414
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-752 clarifies the authority of nurse staffing agencies by deleting any reference to a nurse staffing agency providing personnel to individuals and clarifies they are only authorized to provide personnel to health care facilities and agencies.
Title
Nurse Staffing Agency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-11 | Council | Act A23-0512 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14414 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0512 |
2020-11-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 7, 2020 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0752 |
2020-07-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-05-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0752 Published in the DC Register |
2020-05-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2020-05-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |