DC B23-0817 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0492 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13913
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0492 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13913
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-817 establishes the length of the terms of office for members of the UDC Board of Trustees for alumni and appointed members.
Title
UDC Board of Trustees Term Limit Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-22 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-22 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Act A23-0492 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13913 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0492 |
2020-11-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-09-22 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-09-22 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0817 |
2020-07-31 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0817 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-07-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |