DC B25-0338 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-06 - Law L25-0056, Effective from Sep 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013067, Expires on Apr 28, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-06 - Law L25-0056, Effective from Sep 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013067, Expires on Apr 28, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children’s National Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Children’s National Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-06 | Council | Law L25-0056, Effective from Sep 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013067, Expires on Apr 28, 2024 |
2023-08-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-08-04 | Council | Act A25-0183 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010704 |
2023-08-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-07-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0183 |
2023-07-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 1, 2023 |
2023-07-11 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-06-30 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0338 Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-20 | Council | First Reading |
2023-06-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-06-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |