DC PR21-0998 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-25 - Resolution R21-0644 Effective from November 1, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14398
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-25 - Resolution R21-0644 Effective from November 1, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14398
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Stevens School Disposition Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2016
Title
Stevens School Disposition Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-25 | Council | Resolution R21-0644 Effective from November 1, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14398 |
2016-11-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R21-0644 |
2016-11-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-11-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-10-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |