DC PR23-1012 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Resolution R23-0597, Effective from Nov 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13970
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Resolution R23-0597, Effective from Nov 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13970
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services LLC Option Year One Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services LLC Option Year One Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Resolution R23-0597, Effective from Nov 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13970 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0597 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-11-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |