DC PR23-1025 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Resolution R23-0598, Effective from Nov 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13972
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Resolution R23-0598, Effective from Nov 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13972
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2021 Budget Support Additional Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Fiscal Year 2021 Budget Support Additional Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Resolution R23-0598, Effective from Nov 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13972 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0598 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-11-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |