DC PR25-0632 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Links Trust Inc. Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2024
Title
National Links Trust Inc. Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-03-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-03-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2024-02-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0632 Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0632 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54763/Introduction/PR25-0632-Introduction.pdf |