FL H0125 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on September 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 278 -HJ 1117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 278 -HJ 1117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates act "911 Good Samaritan Act"; provides that person acting in good faith who seeks medical assistance for someone experiencing drug-related overdose may not be charged with specified offenses; provides that person who experiences drug-related overdose & needs medical assistance may not be charged for specified offenses if evidence was obtained as result of overdose & need for assistance; provides that protections from prosecution are not grounds for suppression of evidence in other prosecutions; provides that departure from lowest permissible criminal sentence is permitted when defendant was making good faith effort to obtain or provide medical assistance for someone experiencing drug-related overdose.
Title
Preventing Deaths from Drug-related Overdoses
Sponsors
Rep. Mackenson Bernard [D] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] | Rep. John Julien [D] | Rep. Mark Pafford [D] |
Rep. Steven Perman [D] | Rep. Ari Porth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Laid on Table, refer to SB 278 -HJ 1117 | |
2012-03-06 | Substituted SB 278 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/12 | |
2012-01-19 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 239 | |
2012-01-19 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 239 | |
2012-01-17 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/19/12, 9:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 16 | |
2011-12-07 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 176 | |
2011-12-07 | Favorable by Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 176 | |
2011-11-30 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee, 12/07/11, 9:00 am, 12 HOB | |
2011-10-18 | Now in Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee -HJ 171 | |
2011-10-18 | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 171 | |
2011-10-11 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 10/18/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-10-03 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 16 | |
2011-09-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
893 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/125 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0125/BillText/Filed/HTML |